EP1379068 - Method and system for accounting of services [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin Sanchez, Juan Mario C/Arganda, 4 28005 Madrid / ES | 02 /
Martin De Nicolas, Arturo Oraniestrasse, 10 52066 Aachen / DE | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto, et al Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto, et al Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21 28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2004/02] | Elzaburu, Alberto de, et al Elzaburu S.A. Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 02077601.9 | 01.07.2002 | [2004/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1379068 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/00, H04Q3/00, H04L12/14 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/08 (EP,US);
H04M15/41 (EP,US);
H04M15/49 (EP,US);
H04M15/854 (EP,US);
H04M15/90 (EP,US);
H04M17/20 (EP,US);
H04Q3/005 (EP,US);
H04M2215/016 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0164 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0192 (EP,US);
H04M2215/46 (EP,US);
H04M2215/62 (EP,US);
H04M2215/8166 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Vergebührung von Diensten | [2004/02] | English: | Method and system for accounting of services | [2004/02] | French: | Procédé et système pour la facturation de services | [2004/02] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 26.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.05.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/38] | 18.05.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9951041 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,8,14,15,21 * abstract *; | [A]US6192115 (TOY ARTHUR RANDALL [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,14,15,21 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - line 59 *; | [Y]EP1113677 (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 1-26 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0087] * * column 32, line 29 - line 37 * * column 36, line 50 - column 37, line 7 *; | [Y]EP1189473 (COMVERSE INC [US]) [Y] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0104] *; | [Y] - SCHÄFER, VOLKER, "VIAG: Bei Anruf - Guthaben", WWW.TELTARIF.DE - KOMMUNIKATION GANZ EINFACH, URL: http://www.teltarif.de/arch/2000/kw44/s3423.html, (20021202), XP002224216 [Y] 8-13,21-26 * the whole document * | [A] - TMN PRESS, "TMN promotes mass use of mobile phones and adds a revolutionary concept to its prepaid cards: PAKO charged by incoming calls", TMN PRESS RELEASE, (20000417), URL: http://www.tmn.pt/tmn/noticias/2000_17abr_1.shtml, (20021209), XP002224217 [A] 8,21 * the whole document * | [A] - "Advantage: The network architecture: Service environment for converged networks", SIEMENS PUBLICATION, URL: http://www.siemens.cz/extra/invex/files/06_mobsit/Advantage-network_architecture, (20021203), XP002224218 [A] * page 5, column L - page 6, column L; figures 3,5 * |