EP1260982 - Recording medium defect management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ko, Jung-wan 315-401 Daewoo Apt-956-2 Cheongmyung Maeul 3-danji Youngtong-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si 442-270 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2003/32] |
Former [2002/48] | 01 /
Ko, Jung-wan 684-6 Seo-ri, Yidong-myun Yongin-city, Kyungdo-do / KR | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2002/48] | Chugg, David John, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02078125.8 | 09.11.1999 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | KR19980048008 | 10.11.1998 Original published format: KR 9848008 | KR19990004678 | 10.02.1999 Original published format: KR 9904678 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1260982 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1260982 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18, G11B20/12 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
G11B20/18 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B20/1258 (EP,US);
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1893 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/48] | G11B20/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/04] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fehlerverwaltung für Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2002/48] | English: | Recording medium defect management | [2002/48] | French: | Gestion des défauts pour support d'enregistrement | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 11.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99308938.2 / EP1014365 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990308938) is 20.10.2003 | Request for further processing for: | 22.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1118993 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [E] 12,18-22,25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0350920 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,12,18 * the whole document *; | [A]US5548572 (KULAKOWSKI JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1,12,18 * column 2, line 44 - line 52 * * column 4, line 33 - line 39 * * column 6, line 51 - line 67 * * column 7, line 7 - line 27 *; | [A]US5271018 (CHAN LITKO [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 30 * * column 8, line 1 - line 13 * | [A] - ECMA: STANDARDIZING INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, "Standard ECMA-272: 120 mm DVD Rewritable Disk (DVD-RAM), First Edition", STANDARD ECMA, XX, XX, (199802), no. 272, pages 43 - 51, XP002114221 [A] 1,12,18 * the whole document * |