13.12.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
25.10.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
16.11.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
12.11.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.11.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.07.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.06.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
29.06.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
15.06.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.04.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2010 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
10.11.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
10.11.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
08.11.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.08.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.05.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.01.2010 |
First examination report |
|
07.01.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.09.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
05.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
03.06.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.05.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
09.05.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
25.04.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2007 |
Publication of search report |
published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] |
13.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.08.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] |