Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7512271 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2009 | B2 | US2006228027 | 12.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44978006 | 09.06.2006 | JP2001272555 | 07.09.2001 | JP2001164510 | 31.05.2001 | JP2001093274 | 28.03.2001 | JP2001272557 | 07.09.2001 | US10530902 | 26.03.2002 | JP2001164282 | 31.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003087112 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001272555 | 07.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003085560 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001272557 | 07.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002358523 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001164510 | 31.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4750313B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2011 | B2 | JP2002358503 | 13.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001164282 | 31.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4545978B | Global Dossier | 15.09.2010 | B2 | JP2002288655 | 04.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001093274 | 28.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7274819 | 25.09.2007 | B2 | US2002181775 | 05.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001164510 | 31.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1246121 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2012 | B1 | EP1246121 | 10.10.2007 | A3 | EP1246121 | 02.10.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001272555 | 07.09.2001 | JP2001164510 | 31.05.2001 | JP2001093274 | 28.03.2001 | JP2001272557 | 07.09.2001 | JP2001164282 | 31.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7088860 | 08.08.2006 | B2 | US2002181799 | 05.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001272555 | 07.09.2001 | JP2001164510 | 31.05.2001 | JP2001093274 | 28.03.2001 | JP2001272557 | 07.09.2001 | JP2001164282 | 31.05.2001 |