EP1355204 - Polytetrafluoroethylene film & manufacture of same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN GORE-TEX, INC. 1102-4 Kouchi, Mitsu-cho Mitsu-gun Okoyama-ken 709-2123 / JP | [2006/40] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, Delaware 19714-9206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oyama, Shinro, c/o Japan Gore-tex Inc. 1102-4 Kouchi, Mitsu-cho Mitsu-gun, Okayama-ken 709-2123 / JP | 02 /
Kikukawa, Hiroyasu c/o Japan Gore-Tex, Inc. 1102-4 Kouchi, Mitsu-cho Mitsu-gun, Okayama-ken 709-2123 / JP | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252775.8 | 19.04.2002 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1355204 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1355204 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20, B29C67/24 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
B29C55/005 (EP);
B29C43/003 (EP);
B29C67/24 (EP);
G03G15/2057 (EP);
B29C43/006 (EP);
B29K2027/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/01] |
Former [2003/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Polytetrafluorethylenfilm und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2003/43] | English: | Polytetrafluoroethylene film & manufacture of same | [2003/43] | French: | Film de polytétrafluoroéthylène et procédé de fabrication | [2003/43] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 15.10.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 24.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 09.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09166933 ; | [A]EP0106496 (GORE & ASS [US]) [A] 4 * page 21, line 18 - page 22, line 16 *; | [A]US4910559 (KUGE TSUKASA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 2 * * column 7, line 43 - line 52 *; | [X]US5026513 (HOUSE WAYNE D [US], et al) [X] 4 * column 2, lines 1-11 *; | [A]US5374473 (KNOX JOHN B [US], et al) [A] 3,4 * abstract * * column 2, lines 19-47 *; | [A]WO9710102 (GORE & ASS [US]) [A] 3,4 * page 6, line 37 - page 7, line 7 * * page 11, lines 13-25; claim 3 *; | [A]US5907348 (OGASAWARA MASASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 23, line 50 - line 64 *; | [A]WO0136831 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 7 *; | EP1229259 [ ] (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09166933 A 19970624 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |