Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2286779 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02255771 | 19.08.2002 | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100901839B | Global Dossier | 09.06.2009 | B1 | KR20030017394 | 03.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3957047B | Global Dossier | 08.08.2007 | B2 | JP2003062009 | 04.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002300677B | Global Dossier | 08.01.2009 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1285644 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2010 | B1 | EP1285644 | 26.11.2003 | A3 | EP1285644 | 26.02.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE487452T | 15.11.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2398745 | 02.01.2007 | C | CA2398745 | 23.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1267075C | 02.08.2006 | C | CN1406570 | 02.04.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60238233D1 | 23.12.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2354305T | 11.03.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY144174 | 15.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW576736B | 21.02.2004 | B | Priority number | Date | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003040732 | 27.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001252594 | 23.08.2001 | Type | Divisional application | EP2286779 |