EP1285644 - Pants-type disposable diaper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi, Ehime-ken 182 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishikawa, Hiroki, c/o Technical Center 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
Kinoshita, Akiyoshi, c/o Technical Center 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Eke, Philippa Dianne Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Eke, Philippa Dianne Saunders & Dolleymore 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | ||
Former [2003/09] | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255771.4 | 19.08.2002 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | JP20010252594 | 23.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001252594 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1285644 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1285644 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1285644 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/496, A61F13/539 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
A61F13/496 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/49017 (EP,US);
A61F13/49019 (EP,US);
A61F13/4906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/09] | Title | German: | Wegwerfwindel in Höschenform | [2003/09] | English: | Pants-type disposable diaper | [2003/09] | French: | Couche-culotte jetable | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10181353.3 / EP2286779 | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.11.2010 | BE | 10.11.2010 | CY | 10.11.2010 | CZ | 10.11.2010 | DK | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | BG | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | [2011/38] |
Former [2011/35] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3608551 (SEIJO SABURO) [A] 1-4* column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 6; figure - *; | [X]US5593400 (O'LEARY AUDREY A [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * column W *; | [A]EP0933073 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 29-34; figure - *; | [A]US5947947 (TANZER RICHARD WARREN [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US5957907 (SAUER BARBARA OAKLEY [US]) [A] 3 * column 10, line 65 - column 12, line 45; figure - *; | [A]EP0953325 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 5 * column 4, lines 15-26; figures 3,4 *; | [X]EP1114631 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 3, lines 26-53 * * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 26; figure - * |