Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6773242 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US66313003 | 16.09.2003 | US5072702 | 16.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2295805 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02256932 | 07.10.2002 | US5072702 | 16.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100917873B | Global Dossier | 16.09.2009 | B1 | KR20030062208 | 23.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US5072702 | 16.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002301427B | Global Dossier | 08.01.2009 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US5072702 | 16.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1329636 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2015 | B1 | EP1329636 | 10.09.2003 | A3 | EP1329636 | 23.07.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US5072702 | 16.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0205491 | 25.01.2011 | B1 | BR0205491 | 03.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US5072702 | 16.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100335789C | 05.09.2007 | C | CN1432737 | 30.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US5072702 | 16.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100545455C | 30.09.2009 | C | CN101078400 | 28.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US5072702 | 16.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW580537B | 21.03.2004 | B | Priority number | Date | US5072702 | 16.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6619936 | 16.09.2003 | B2 | US2003133819 | 17.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5072702 | 16.01.2002 | Type | Divisional application | EP2295805 |