EP1329636 - Scroll compressor with vapor injection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 1675 W. Campbell Road Sidney, OH 45365-0669 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states COPELAND CORPORATION 1675 W Campbell Road Sidney Ohio 45365-0669 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perevozchikov, Michael M 668 Heatherstone Court Tipp city, Ohio 45371 / US | [2003/30] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2015/31] |
Former [2003/30] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256932.1 | 07.10.2002 | [2003/30] | Priority number, date | US20020050727 | 16.01.2002 Original published format: US 50727 | [2003/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1329636 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1329636 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1329636 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/02, F04C18/02, F04C29/04, F04C29/00 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
F04C29/023 (EP,US);
F04C18/02 (KR);
F04C29/0007 (EP,US);
F04C29/042 (EP,US);
F04C18/0215 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/30] | F04C18/02, F04C29/00, F04C29/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2015/31] |
Former [2004/23] | DE, FR | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spiralverdichter mit Dampfeinspritzung | [2003/30] | English: | Scroll compressor with vapor injection | [2003/30] | French: | Compresseur à volutes avec injection de vapeur | [2003/30] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 06.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10012548.3 / EP2295805 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2004 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.04.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.04.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10169576 ; | [X]JPH03271583 ; | [X]US5469716 (BASS MARK [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 3-5; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US5640854 (FOGT JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 6, line 30 - line 64 *; | [X]US6053715 (HIRANO HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 7, line 12 - line 67; figures 5A-5H * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10169576 A 19980623 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920305), vol. 016, no. 090, Database accession no. (M - 1218), & JP03271583 A 19911203 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * | Examination | US4382370 | US4676075 | JPH0422781 | JPH0431683 | by applicant | US4877382 |