Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
05.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
04.01.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.11.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.07.2005 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.07.2005 | Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
08.07.2005 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.04.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
24.01.2005 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.11.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.10.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
12.10.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
17.09.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
17.09.2004 | First examination report | |
18.06.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] |
14.05.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] |
26.09.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
14.03.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |