Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003159792 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US4419801 | 26.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1306223 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2003 | A3 | EP1306223 | 02.05.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US4419801 | 26.10.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6508552 | 21.01.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US4419801 | 26.10.2001 |