EP1306223 - A printer having precision ink drying capability and method of assembling the printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinfield, Steven W. 9606 Lynne Anne Lane San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 02 /
Askeland, Ronald A. 11371 Penanova Street San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 03 /
Arbeiter, Jason R. 14023 Ipava Drive Poway, CA 92064 / US | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/18] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256977.6 | 04.10.2002 | [2003/18] | Priority number, date | US20010044198 | 26.10.2001 Original published format: US 44198 | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1306223 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1306223 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41J11/00 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
B41J11/002 (EP,US);
B41J11/00214 (EP,US);
B41J11/00216 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/32] |
Former [2003/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drucker mit Präzisionstintentrocknungsfunktion und Verfahren zum Zusammenbau des Druckers | [2003/18] | English: | A printer having precision ink drying capability and method of assembling the printer | [2003/18] | French: | Imprimante ayant une capacité précise à sècher l'encre et procédé pour assembler ladite imprimante | [2003/18] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 21.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 10.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0737583 (NUR ADVANCED TECH LTD [IL]) [A] 1,5,8,9,13,16,17,21,24 * column 5, lines 5-19 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 4 *; | [A]EP0875382 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 6-8,14-16,22-24* column 12, lines 24-31 *; | [X]EP0978388 (MATTI TECHNOLOGY GMBH [CH]) [X] 1-5,8-10,13,16-21,24 * column 3, lines 15-23 * * column 6, lines 22-46 * * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 39 *; | [XA]WO0117780 (L & P PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8,17,21,24 * page 2, lines 19-23 * * page 7, lines 4-31 * [A] 9,13,16; | [DA]US6256903 (RUDD PAUL D [US]) [DA] 6,8,9,14,16,22,24 * column 11, line 41 - column 12, line 41 * |