EP1326200 - Voice annotations for smart cards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Donald X. II 2990 NW Acacia Place Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/28] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02259003.8 | 30.12.2002 | [2003/28] | Priority number, date | US20020043034 | 08.01.2002 Original published format: US 43034 | [2003/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1326200 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1326200 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06, G06K19/07, G06K19/08 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
G06K19/06 (EP,US);
G06K19/07 (EP,US);
G06K19/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/14] |
Former [2003/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sprachkommentare für Chipkarten | [2003/28] | English: | Voice annotations for smart cards | [2003/28] | French: | Annotations vocale pour des cartes à puce | [2003/28] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 21.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 22.07.2009 | [2009/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2712714 (BOULAY JEAN MARIE [FR]) [X] 1-5,8 * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 16 * [Y] 7; | [Y]DE19609732 (BEDRICH MICHAEL R DIPL PHYS [DE]) [Y] 7 * claims 1,11-13 *; | [XA]US6094279 (SOSCIA PETER P [US]) [X] 10 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 52; figure 1 *[A] 1,8 |