22.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
13.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
23.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
09.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
07.08.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
17.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
19.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
01.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
27.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
13.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
13.03.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
27.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
20.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |
13.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
16.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
09.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
14.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
12.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
04.04.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
01.04.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.04.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.11.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.10.2007 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
05.10.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.11.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.09.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.08.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.05.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
04.01.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
10.09.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
06.08.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.12.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] |
19.12.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] |