Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003263465 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2004 | A8 | AU2003263465 | 09.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02291879 | 24.07.2002 | IB0304105 | 24.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004010139 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2004 | A3 | WO2004010139 | 29.01.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02291879 | 24.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1387167 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2008 | B1 | EP1387167 | 04.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02291879 | 24.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE394671T | 15.05.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP02291879 | 24.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60226430D1 | 19.06.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP02291879 | 24.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2306752T | 16.11.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP02291879 | 24.07.2002 |