EP1387167 - Method for identifying biologically active compounds with anti-asthmatic and/or anti-allergic properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/06] | Method for identifying biologically active compounds with anti-asthmatic, anti-allergic and/or immunosuppresive properties | ||
[2007/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | ||
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryffel, Bernhard 308, rue du Bois des Prés 45560 Saint Denis en Val / FR | 02 /
Couillin, Isabelle 4, rue du Vieux Moulin 41500 Avaray / FR | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Breesé, Pierre Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Breese, Pierre NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/06] | Breesé, Pierre BREESE - MAJEROWICZ, 3, avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291879.1 | 24.07.2002 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1387167 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387167 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, C07K14/705 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
G01N33/502 (EP);
G01N33/5008 (EP);
G01N2333/705 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren um biologische aktive Verbindungen zu identifizieren, die anti-asthmatische und/oder anti-allergische Eigenschaften haben | [2007/46] | English: | Method for identifying biologically active compounds with anti-asthmatic and/or anti-allergic properties | [2007/46] | French: | Méthode pour isoler des composés biologiques actifs ayant des propriétés anti-asthmatiques et/ou anti-allergiques | [2007/46] |
Former [2004/06] | Verfahren um biologische aktive Verbindungen zu identifizieren, die anti-asthmatische, anti-allergische und/oder immunosuppressive Eigenschaften haben | ||
Former [2004/06] | Method for identifying biologically active compounds with anti-asthmatic, anti-allergic and/or immunosuppresive properties | ||
Former [2004/06] | Méthode pour isoler des composés biologiques actifs ayant des propriétés anti-asthmatiques, anti-allergiques et/ou immunosuppressives | Examination procedure | 31.07.2002 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 15.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2008 | BE | 07.05.2008 | CY | 07.05.2008 | CZ | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | FI | 07.05.2008 | NL | 07.05.2008 | SK | 07.05.2008 | TR | 07.05.2008 | IE | 24.07.2008 | LU | 24.07.2008 | CH | 31.07.2008 | LI | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | BG | 07.08.2008 | SE | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CY | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
TR | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 24.07.2008 | ||
LU | 24.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CY | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 24.07.2008 | ||
LU | 24.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 24.07.2008 | ||
LU | 24.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 24.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0136488 (LEIV EIRIKSSON NYFOTEK AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claim - *; | [Y]WO0155386 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE [GB], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 17, paragraph 2 * * page 18, paragraph 3 - page 26, paragraph 1 * * claims 22,23,26,28 *; | [X] - LIEN E ET AL, "Toll - like receptor 2 functions as a pattern recognition receptor for diverse bacterial products", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19991119), vol. 274, no. 47, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 33419 - 33425, XP002161197 [X] 14,16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.47.33419 | [YD] - TAKEUCHI OSAMU ET AL, "Cutting Edge: Role of toll-like receptor 1 in mediating immune response to microbial lipoproteins.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, July 1, 2002, (20020701), vol. 169, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 10 - 14, XP002228542 [YD] 1-12 * the whole document * | [Y] - HALLMAN MIKKO ET AL, "Toll-like receptors as sensors of pathogens.", PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, (200109), vol. 50, no. 3, ISSN 0031-3998, pages 315 - 321, XP002228543 [Y] 8,12 * abstract * * page 318, column 2, paragraph 4 * | Examination | WO9952549 | WO9966947 | WO0174375 | - FLO T H; HALAAS O; LIEN E; RYAN L; TETI G; GOLENBOCK D T; SUNDAN A; ESPEVIK T, "Human toll - like receptor 2 mediates monocyte activation by Listeria monocytogenes, but not by group B streptococci or lipopolysaccharide", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, USA, (20000215), vol. 164, no. 4, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2064 - 2069, XP002161196 | - AKIRA SHIZUO; TAKEDA KIYOSHI; KAISHO TSUNEYASU, "Toll-like receptors: Critical proteins linking innate and acquired immunity", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, (200108), vol. 2, no. 8, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 675 - 680, XP002974836 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/90609 |