EP1303069 - Système pour générer des signaux de brouillage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/16] | Procédé et système pour générer des signaux de brouillage | ||
[2005/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 173, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunet, Daniel, Thales Intellectuel Property 13, av, du Prés. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 02 /
Garreau, Frédéric, Thales Intellectuel Property 13, av, du Prés. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Dudouit, Isabelle Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dudouit, Isabelle Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/16] | Dudouit, Isabelle Thales Intelectual Property 13, avenue Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02292481.5 | 08.10.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | FR20010012976 | 09.10.2001 Original published format: FR 0112976 | [2003/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1303069 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1303069 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | [2003/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1303069 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04K3/00 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
H04K3/28 (EP);
H04K3/226 (EP);
H04K3/42 (EP);
H04K2203/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/16] | Title | German: | System für die Erzeugung von Störsignalen | [2005/10] | English: | Système pour générer des signaux de brouillage | [2005/10] | French: | System for the generation of jamming signals | [2005/10] |
Former [2003/16] | Verfahren und System für die Erzeugung von Störsignalen | ||
Former [2003/16] | Procédé et système pour générer des signaux de brouillage | ||
Former [2003/16] | Method and system for the generation of jamming signals | Examination procedure | 01.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.12.2005 | CY | 14.12.2005 | CZ | 14.12.2005 | EE | 14.12.2005 | IE | 14.12.2005 | SK | 14.12.2005 | BG | 14.03.2006 | DK | 14.03.2006 | GR | 14.03.2006 | SE | 14.03.2006 | PT | 15.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/28] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
EE | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CZ | 14.12.2005 | ||
SK | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 14.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0082055 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1,5 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 18 * * page 5, line 7 - line 18 *; | [X]FR2573216 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 1 - line 24 * * page 2, line 16 - line 20 * * page 2, line 33 - line 37 * * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 2 *; | [A]FR2589655 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 24 * * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 3 * * page 2, line 13 - line 20 ** page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 11 * |