13.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
09.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
10.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
25.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
25.07.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
13.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
09.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
22.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
01.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
17.08.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
24.07.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.07.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.11.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.07.2006 |
First examination report |
|
14.07.2006 |
Change - first examination report |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
11.07.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.07.2006 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2005 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] |
22.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] |
12.05.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
12.05.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
24.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.12.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.10.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] |
24.10.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] |
18.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|