Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6861566 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2005 | B2 | US2004097763 | 20.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001068337 | 12.03.2001 | JP0202240 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1369405 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2007 | B1 | EP1369405 | 04.01.2006 | A4 | EP1369405 | 10.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001068337 | 12.03.2001 | JP0202240 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60222536T | 19.06.2008 | T2 | DE60222536D1 | 31.10.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001068337 | 12.03.2001 | JP0202240 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0303440 | 01.03.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001068337 | 12.03.2001 | JP0202240 | 11.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02072512 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001068337 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4038024B | Global Dossier | 23.01.2008 | B2 | JP2002265399 | 18.09.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001068337 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE373631T | 15.10.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001068337 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2298346T | 16.05.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2001068337 | 12.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1369405E | 31.12.2007 | E | Priority number | Date | JP2001068337 | 12.03.2001 |