EP1369405 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING 1-CHLORO-4-ARYLBUTANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | [2007/38] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | ||
For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | |||
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8526 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIBINO, Hiroaki 3-1-29-252, Kentoku-machi Oita-shi, Oita 870-0025 / JP | 02 /
OHTSUKA, Susumu 2-1-3-341, Kuwata-cho Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
MIYAMOTO, Yasunobu 2-10-6-301, Sonehigashinocho Toyonaka-shi Osaka / JP | 04 /
OKUMOTO, Itsuo 1-5-2, Yamagishi technoport, Mikuni-cho Sakai-gun, Fukui 913-0032 / JP | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/50] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 02702871.1 | 11.03.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002JP02240 | Priority number, date | JP20010068337 | 12.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001068337 | [2003/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02072512 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1369405 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1369405 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/263, C07C22/04 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
C07C41/30 (EP,US);
C07C17/2632 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/2632, C07C22/04 (EP,US);
C07C41/30, C07C43/225 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1-CHLOR-4-ARYLBUTAN | [2003/50] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING 1-CHLORO-4-ARYLBUTANE | [2003/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE 1-CHLORO-4-ARYLBUTANE | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2003 | Translation filed | 05.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 12.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.09.2007 | CY | 19.09.2007 | DK | 19.09.2007 | FI | 19.09.2007 | NL | 19.09.2007 | TR | 19.09.2007 | SE | 19.12.2007 | GR | 20.12.2007 | LU | 11.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
LU | 11.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 19.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4331820 (TAGUCHI KENICHI, et al) [Y] 1-3,5-7,10 * column 2; example 1 *; | [A]US4408077 (SESTANJ KAZIMIR [CA], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7* column 9 *; | [Y]US5659084 (GOMBATZ KERRY JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-7,10 * example 2 *; | [Y] - KRUGLOVA, N.V. ET AL., "Reaction of alpha, alpha - dichloro- omega - bromoalkanes and alpha, alpha - dichloro - omega - bromoalkenes with benzylmagnesium and allylmagnesium halides", BULLETIN OF THE ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USSR. DIVISION OF CHEMICAL SCIENCE., USCONSULTANTS BUREAU. NEW YORK., (1972), vol. 21, pages 839 - 842, XP008055048 [Y] 1-3,5-7,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00854483 | International search | [A]US4272545 (WALKER KEITH A M); | [A] - KRUGLOVA N.V. & FREIDLINA R.KH., "Reaction of alpha,alpha-dichloro-omega-bromoalkanes and alpha,alpha-dichloro-omega-bromoalkenes with benzyl- and allylmagnesium halides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1972), vol. 77, no. 13, Database accession no. 87716Z, page 352, XP002951553 | [ ] - IZV. AKAD. NAUK SSSR, SER. KHIM., (1972), no. 4, pages 886 - 890 | Examination | - ROSSANDER; MARVEL, "The reaction of the Grignard reagent with gamma-chloropropyl para-toluenesulfonate. A method of lengthening carbon chains by three carbon atoms", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1928), vol. 50, pages 1491 - 1497 |