EP1374473 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURE CRYPTOGRAPHIC KEY GENERATION, CERTIFICATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arcot Systems, Inc. Suite 200, 3200 Patrick Henry Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2011/08] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Arcot Systems, Inc. Suite 200, 3200 Patrick Henry Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRD, Geoffrey, R. 10274 Parkwood Drive, Apt.4 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Abnett, Richard Charles REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02719388.7 | 29.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002US09812 | Priority number, date | US20010280629P | 29.03.2001 Original published format: US 280629 P | US20010874795 | 05.06.2001 Original published format: US 874795 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02080445 | Date: | 10.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374473 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1374473 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04L9/08 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
G06F21/62 (EP,US);
H04L9/0869 (EP,US);
H04L9/3226 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
H04L2209/046 (EP,US);
H04L2209/20 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/31] | H04K1/00, H04L9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2004/01] | H04L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SICHEREN KRYPTOGRAPHISCHEN SCHLÜSSELERZEUGUNG, -ZERTIFIZIERUNG UND -BENUTZUNG | [2004/01] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SECURE CRYPTOGRAPHIC KEY GENERATION, CERTIFICATION AND USE | [2004/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE CREER, DE CERTIFIER ET D'UTILISER UNE CLE CRYPTOGRAPHIQUE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 02.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2010 | 07.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10009777.3 Application withdrawn : 15.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | BE | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | IT | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | IE | 29.03.2011 | LU | 29.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | ES | 03.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 29.03.2011 | ||
LU | 29.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 29.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 29.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 23.02.2011 | |
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9925086 (SONERA OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-43* the whole document *; | [A]WO0030285 (ARCOT SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-43 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US3798605 (FEISTEL H); | [Y]US5206905 (LEE ROBERT D [US], et al); | [A]US5668876 (FALK JOHAN PER [SE], et al); | [A]US5894519 (CLEMOT OLIVIER [FR], et al); | [Y]US6170058 (KAUSIK BALAS NATARAJAN [US]); | [A]US6408388 (FISCHER ADDISON M [US]) |