20.03.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] |
03.12.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.05.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.06.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2006 |
First examination report |
|
12.12.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
11.06.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
25.05.2004 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
05.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2004 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.02.2004 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.12.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] |
19.12.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] |
03.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|