Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1386502 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0200710 | 10.04.2002 | SE0101270 | 10.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02085053 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0101270 | 10.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE518826 | 26.11.2002 | C2 | SE0101270L | 11.10.2002 | L | SE0101270D0 | 10.04.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE0101270 | 10.04.2001 |