EP1386502 - A SYSTEM FOR COMMUNICATING MESSAGES BETWEEN CLIENTS IN A RADIO NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etheraction AB Lumavägen 6:1B 120 31 Stockholm / SE | [2004/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEUDER, Patrick Maria Prästgardsgata 1 c S-118 52 Stockholm / SE | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Karlström, Lennart, et al Noréns Patentbyrå AB Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Karlström, Lennart, et al Noréns Patentbyra AB, Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 02723007.7 | 10.04.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002SE00710 | Priority number, date | SE20010001270 | 10.04.2001 Original published format: SE 0101270 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02085053 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1386502 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
H04H60/91 (EP);
H04H20/57 (EP);
H04L12/1827 (EP);
H04L9/40 (EP);
H04M3/567 (EP);
H04L12/189 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM ÜBERMITTELN VON NACHRICHTEN ZWISCHEN CLIENTS IN EINEM FUNKNETZWERK | [2004/06] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR COMMUNICATING MESSAGES BETWEEN CLIENTS IN A RADIO NETWORK | [2004/06] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION DE MESSAGES ENTRE DES CLIENTS DANS UN RESEAU RADIO | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 10.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 08.01.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 10.02.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 14.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9810608 (ORANGE PERSONAL COMM SERV LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO0079826 (INCIRCO AB [SE], et al); | [A] - MADOKA MITSUOKA ET AL., "Instant messaging with mobile phones to support awareness", PROC. SYMP. ON APPL. AND THE INTERNET, (20010108), pages 223 - 230, XP002906981 |