27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
29.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
10.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
20.01.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
13.01.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
06.01.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] |
30.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
04.11.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
10.06.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
25.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
02.07.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
10.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.11.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.09.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.08.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
04.05.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2007 |
First examination report |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2005 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] |
13.05.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
13.05.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
22.02.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] |
22.10.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] |
13.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|