Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03076055 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0202699 | 12.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7501084 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2009 | B2 | US2005202182 | 15.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0202699 | 12.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002254943 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0202699 | 12.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1483041 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2010 | B1 | EP1483041 | 08.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0202699 | 12.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE476247T | 15.08.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP0202699 | 12.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2478445 | 30.10.2007 | C | CA2478445 | 18.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0202699 | 12.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50214573D1 | 16.09.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP0202699 | 12.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1483041T | 29.11.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP0202699 | 12.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2350296T | 20.01.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP0202699 | 12.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0501193 | 28.04.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP0202699 | 12.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1483041E | 10.11.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | EP0202699 | 12.03.2002 |