EP1483041 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FABRIC-REINFORCED CAPILLARY MEMBRANES, IN PARTICULAR FOR ULTRAFILTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koch Membrane Systems GmbH Kackertstrasse 10 52072 Aachen / DE | [2007/37] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Koch Membrane Systems GmbH Kranzstrasse 7 52070 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Puron AG Krantzstrasse 7 52070 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOSSENKAUL, Klaus Schlottfelder Winkel 12 52074 Aachen / DE | 02 /
SCHÄFER, Stefan Wildbachstrasse 49 52074 Aachen / DE | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Rainer Harald Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02724224.7 | 12.03.2002 | [2004/50] | WO2002EP02699 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03076055 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1483041 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1483041 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/08, B01D69/12, B01D67/00, D06B3/04 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
B01D69/10 (EP,US);
B01D67/0016 (EP,US);
B01D69/08 (EP,US);
B01D2325/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG GEWEBEVERSTÄRKTER KAPILLARFÖRMIGER MEMBRANEN, INSBESONDERE FÜR DIE ULTRAFILTRATION | [2004/50] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING FABRIC-REINFORCED CAPILLARY MEMBRANES, IN PARTICULAR FOR ULTRAFILTRATION | [2004/50] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES MEMBRANES CAPILLAIRES A RENFORT DE TISSU, NOTAMMENT DESTINEES A L'ULTRAFILTRATION | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 08.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.08.2010 | TR | 04.08.2010 | AT | 12.03.2011 | FI | 12.03.2011 | GB | 12.03.2011 | IE | 12.03.2011 | IT | 12.03.2011 | LU | 12.03.2011 | ES | 13.03.2011 | SE | 13.03.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | DK | 31.03.2011 | FR | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 12.03.2011 | ||
FI | 12.03.2011 | ||
GB | 12.03.2011 | ||
IE | 12.03.2011 | ||
IT | 12.03.2011 | ||
LU | 12.03.2011 | ||
ES | 13.03.2011 | ||
SE | 13.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
DK | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 12.03.2011 | ||
FI | 12.03.2011 | ||
GB | 12.03.2011 | ||
IE | 12.03.2011 | ||
IT | 12.03.2011 | ||
ES | 13.03.2011 | ||
SE | 13.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
DK | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 12.03.2011 | ||
FI | 12.03.2011 | ||
GB | 12.03.2011 | ||
IE | 12.03.2011 | ||
IT | 12.03.2011 | ||
ES | 13.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
DK | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 12.03.2011 | ||
GB | 12.03.2011 | ||
IE | 12.03.2011 | ||
IT | 12.03.2011 | ||
ES | 13.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
DK | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 12.03.2011 | ||
GB | 12.03.2011 | ||
IE | 12.03.2011 | ||
IT | 12.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
DK | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 12.03.2011 | ||
GB | 12.03.2011 | ||
IE | 12.03.2011 | ||
IT | 12.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 12.03.2011 | ||
IE | 12.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 12.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 12.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
FR | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 12.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 12.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 04.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2456650 (RYAN ALBERT O); | [AD]US4061821 (HAYANO FUSAKAZU, et al); | [A]GB1540937 (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE); | [A]GB2048726 (POST OFFICE); | [A]US4579079 (NUNDY STANLEY D [CA]); | [A]WO9318219 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) |