10.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
20.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
15.02.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
10.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |
23.01.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.01.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.09.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.11.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] |
11.11.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.10.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.06.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
08.06.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
04.06.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.06.2004 |
First examination report |
|
11.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.12.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] |
19.12.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] |
18.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|