EP1385904 - LOW-DENSITY SEALING MASS, GROUND MASS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemetall GmbH Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt / DE | [2004/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONS, Peter Bergstrasse 3 61203 Reichelsheim / DE | 02 /
BUROCK, Heinz Panoramastrasse 20b 65527 Niedernhausen / DE | 03 /
DIEZ, Francisco Kelsterbacher Strasse 127 64546 Moerfelden-Walldorf / DE | 04 /
PAUL, Andrea Niedergärtenstrasse 27 63533 Mainhausen / DE | 05 /
DIEHL, Heiko Haardtgasse 4 67487 Sankt Martin / DE | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Uppena, Franz Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2006/02] | Uppena, Franz c/o Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2004/06] | Uppena, Franz, Dr. Dynamit Nobel Aktiengesellschaft, Patente, Marken & Lizenzen 53839 Troisdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02727531.2 | 05.04.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002EP03815 | Priority number, date | DE2001117251 | 06.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10117251 | [2004/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02081560 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1385904 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1385904 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08K7/22, C08L81/00 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C08L81/02 (EP,US);
C08L81/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L81/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L81/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTMASSE NIEDRIGER DICHTE, GRUNDMASSE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG SOWIE IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2004/06] | English: | LOW-DENSITY SEALING MASS, GROUND MASS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND THE USE THEREOF | [2004/06] | French: | MASSE D'ETANCHEITE DE FAIBLE DENSITE, MASSE PRIMAIRE CORRESPONDANTE, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET SON UTILISATION | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 28.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.04.2007 | [2009/33] | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0268837 (PROD RES & CHEM CORP [US]) [X] 1-31 * claim 3 * * page 4, lines 23-27 * * page 5, line 12 ** examples I,II,IV *; | [XD]US5663219 (CHOKSHI KANU R [US], et al) [XD] 1-31 * claims 1,2,8 * * examples 1-18 *; | [X]WO9839365 (COURTAULDS AEROSPACE INC [US]) [X] 1-31 * claims 1,30,37,41,42 * * examples 14,15 * * page 8, lines 32-34 * * page 11, lines 18-27 * * page 16, lines 18-21 * * page 17, lines 8,9 * * page 17, line 25 * |