|
24.04.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.05.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.05.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.02.2010 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2007 |
Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.07.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.07.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.09.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.05.2004 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2004 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.01.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
21 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |