26.04.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
18.05.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
11.05.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.05.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2011 |
Change - designated states |
published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] |
15.12.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.08.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
09.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] |
11.07.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.01.2007 |
First examination report |
|
03.01.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
29.10.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
03.09.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
03.09.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
16.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|