Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100899047B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2009 | B1 | KR20040032971 | 17.04.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US2726901 | 21.12.2001 | US0217605 | 04.06.2002 | US31588201 | 29.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4141953B | Global Dossier | 27.08.2008 | B2 | JP2005525136 | 25.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US2726901 | 21.12.2001 | US0217605 | 04.06.2002 | US31588201 | 29.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002259337B | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US2726901 | 21.12.2001 | US0217605 | 04.06.2002 | US31588201 | 29.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1467705 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2012 | B1 | EP1467705 | 20.10.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US2726901 | 21.12.2001 | US0217605 | 04.06.2002 | US31588201 | 29.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2453312 | 30.03.2010 | C | CA2453312 | 13.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2726901 | 21.12.2001 | US0217605 | 04.06.2002 | US31588201 | 29.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04000934 | 02.04.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US2726901 | 21.12.2001 | US0217605 | 04.06.2002 | US31588201 | 29.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03020240 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2004 | A3 | WO03020240 | 13.03.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US2726901 | 21.12.2001 | US31588201 | 29.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR036378 | 01.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2726901 | 21.12.2001 | US31588201 | 29.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6899700 | 31.05.2005 | B2 | US2003045829 | 06.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2726901 | 21.12.2001 | US31588201 | 29.08.2001 |