EP1467705 - THERAPEUTIC AGENT DELIVERY TAMPON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [2012/25] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEHLING, Steven, Craig 1025 Alpine Court Oshkosh, WI 54901 / US | 02 /
KEELY, Charles, Christopher 9407 Memory Lane Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 03 /
LINDSAY, Jeffrey, Dean 20 Diane Lane Appleton, WI 54915 / US | 04 /
GEISER, Kimberly, Marie 1002 W. Prospect Avenue Appleton, WI 54914 / US | 05 /
KOENIG, David, William 1486 Plank Road Menasha, WI 54952 / US | 06 /
MINERATH, Bernard, Joseph 2301 Vinland Street Oshkosh, WI 54901 / US | 07 /
DVORACEK, Barbara, Jo 23 Shamrock Court Appleton, WI 54914 / US | 08 /
TYRRELL, David, John 415 South Olde Oneida Street, Apt. 318 Appleton, WI 54911 / US | 09 /
KRZYSIK, Duane, Gerard 1112 E. Melrose Avenue Appleton, WI 54911 / US | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Mabey, Katherine Frances Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Mabey, Katherine Frances Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2007/33] | Mabey, Katherine Frances Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/43] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02729340.6 | 04.06.2002 | [2004/43] | WO2002US17605 | Priority number, date | US20010315882P | 29.08.2001 Original published format: US 315882 P | US20010027269 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: US 27269 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03020240 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1467705 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1467705 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
A61F13/8405 (EP,US);
A61L15/42 (KR);
A61F13/2051 (EP,US);
A61F13/2085 (EP,US);
A61K9/0036 (EP,US);
A61L15/40 (EP,US);
A61L15/44 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP);
A61L2300/30 (EP,US);
A61L2300/40 (EP,US);
A61L2300/402 (EP,US);
A61L2300/41 (EP,US);
A61L2300/432 (EP,US);
A61L2300/602 (EP,US);
Y10S604/904 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2012/03] |
Former [2004/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | TAMPON ZUR ABGABE EINES THERAPEUTISCHEN MITTELS | [2004/43] | English: | THERAPEUTIC AGENT DELIVERY TAMPON | [2004/43] | French: | TAMPON D'APPORT D'AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 20.06.2012 | [2012/48] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4309997 (DONALD JACK W) [A] 44-50 * figure 1 ** column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 20 *; | [A]US4318405 (SNEIDER VINCENT R) [A] 44-50 * figures 2-5 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 14 *; | [X]US5273521 (PEILER FRANCES K [US], et al) [X] 43-46,49,50 * column 2, line 31 - line 46 * * column 3, line 21 - line 42 * * figure 3 *; | [X]US5295984 (CONTENTE AUDREY [US], et al) [X] 43,44,46,49,50 * figure 13 * * column 11, line 27 - line 57 * * column 15, line 61 - column 16, line 11 *; | [A]US5527534 (MYHLING JOHN [US]) [A] 43-50 * see abstract * * figure 4 * |