01.04.2016 |
Refusal of application |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
02.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
30.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.01.2015 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
14.01.2015 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
01.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2011 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
15.03.2011 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal |
|
28.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.01.2011 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
14.01.2011 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
28.10.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
28.10.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
18.05.2010 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
28.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.11.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.06.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2007 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
26.05.2007 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
19.05.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.05.2007 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
03.03.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.07.2006 |
First examination report |
|
20.07.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
14.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.03.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.11.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.09.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
19.09.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
12.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2003 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
09.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|