Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1393171
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.12.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
31.08.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.03.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.06.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.02.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.04.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
14.04.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
28.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.01.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
19.01.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
03.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|