Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100538371B | Global Dossier | 21.12.2005 | B1 | KR20030074801 | 19.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0200151 | 16.01.2002 | US78161501 | 12.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004529412 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0200151 | 16.01.2002 | US78161501 | 12.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002219382 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0200151 | 16.01.2002 | US78161501 | 12.02.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1393171 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0200151 | 16.01.2002 | US78161501 | 12.02.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02065277 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2003 | A3 | WO02065277 | 22.08.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US78161501 | 12.02.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1258139C | 31.05.2006 | C | CN1526094 | 01.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US78161501 | 12.02.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002147962 | 10.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78161501 | 12.02.2001 |