EP1393171 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR INCORPORATING LEGACY APPLICATIONS INTO A DISTRIBUTED DATA PROCESSING ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATANAKA, Iwao 8 Houghton Lane Acton, MA 01720 / US | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Litherland, David Peter IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Litherland, David Peter IBM United Kingdom Ltd., MP 110, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 02740084.5 | 16.01.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002GB00151 | Priority number, date | US20010781615 | 12.02.2001 Original published format: US 781615 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02065277 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1393171 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
G06F8/70 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F8/76 (EP,US);
G06F9/465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM EINFÜGEN VON LEGACY-ANWENDUNGEN IN EINE VERTEILTE DATENVERARBEITUNGSUMGEBUNG | [2004/10] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR INCORPORATING LEGACY APPLICATIONS INTO A DISTRIBUTED DATA PROCESSING ENVIRONMENT | [2004/10] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT D'INCORPORER DES APPLICATIONS PATRIMONIALES DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES REPARTI | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - COMELLA-DORDA S ET AL, "A survey of black-box modernization approaches for information systems", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS ARTICLE, (20001011), pages 173 - 183, XP010522527 [X] 1,2,4-9,11 * page 180, column L, paragraph 3 - page 181, column R; figure 5 * | [X] - GANNOD G C ET AL, "An architecture-based approach for synthesizing and integrating adapters for legacy software", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS ARTICLE, (20001123), pages 128 - 137, XP010527954 [X] 1,2,4-9,11 * abstract * * section 2.3 * |