EP1399216 - URINARY DYSFUNCTION TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Urologica AG Zugerstrasse 74 6341 Baar / CH | [2009/07] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Surgical Development AG Zugerstrasse 74 6341 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSELL, Peter Aegeristrasse 66 CH-6300 Zug / CH | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/13] | Rosenquist, Per Olof Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 02741591.8 | 24.06.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002SE01241 | Priority number, date | SE20010002312 | 28.06.2001 Original published format: SE 0102312 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03002192 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1399216 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61N1/08, // (A61B17/00, A61N1:05) | [2004/13] | CPC: |
A61N1/36007 (EP,US);
A61F2/0036 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HARNFUNKTIONSSTÖRUNGEN | [2004/13] | English: | URINARY DYSFUNCTION TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2004/13] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DU DYSFONCTIONNEMENT URINAIRE | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 08.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 21.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.06.2008 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 17.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2008 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 22.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/50] | 20.10.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/50] | Appeal following examination | 03.04.2009 | Appeal received No. T1212/09 | 03.04.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.10.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2008 | Decision despatched | 03.06.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 03.06.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0019939 (BIO CONTROL MEDICAL LTD [IL], et al); | [X]WO0110357 (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al); | [A]WO0112108 (BLOMBERG AXEL [FR], et al); | [X] - CALDWELL K.P.S., "Sphincter stimulators to prevent incontinence", NURSING TIMES, (19731115), pages 1524 - 1525, XP002956226 | Examination | WO0147433 | by applicant | US4222377 | US4571749 | US4619245 | US4739764 | US4969474 | US5520606 | US5562598 | WO0019939 |