|
19.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Reply to communication about intention to grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
24.07.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2004 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.12.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Annex |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Annex |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
18.09.2003 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
17 |
|
04.09.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.09.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2003 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
04.09.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.07.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.06.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.06.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.06.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.05.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.05.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.05.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.05.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
15.05.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.11.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
26.11.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.07.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
02.05.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
05.03.2002 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |