26.06.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
21.11.2008 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
09.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
21.09.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
18.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
13.10.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
06.10.2006 |
Change - designated states |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
05.10.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.10.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.06.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] |
16.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
10.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.12.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.10.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] |
31.10.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] |
23.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
23.09.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
17.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|