Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004118156 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65574403 | 05.09.2003 | DE10139648 | 11.08.2001 | EP0202395 | 05.03.2002 | DE10111405 | 08.03.2001 | US90247301 | 10.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100876460B | Global Dossier | 31.12.2008 | B1 | KR20030092014 | 03.12.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10139648 | 11.08.2001 | EP0202395 | 05.03.2002 | DE10111405 | 08.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4307076B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2009 | B2 | JP2004521851 | 22.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10139648 | 11.08.2001 | EP0202395 | 05.03.2002 | DE10111405 | 08.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1370495 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2006 | B1 | EP1370495 | 17.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10139648 | 11.08.2001 | EP0202395 | 05.03.2002 | DE10111405 | 08.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1313399C | 02.05.2007 | C | CN1522230 | 18.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10139648 | 11.08.2001 | EP0202395 | 05.03.2002 | DE10111405 | 08.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50208706D1 | 28.12.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE50208706 | 05.03.2002 | DE10139648 | 11.08.2001 | EP0202395 | 05.03.2002 | DE10111405 | 08.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20033920L | 04.09.2003 | L | NO20033920D0 | 04.09.2003 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE10139648 | 11.08.2001 | EP0202395 | 05.03.2002 | DE10111405 | 08.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6755049 | 29.06.2004 | B2 | US2002139143 | 03.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10111405 | 08.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02070414 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10139648 | 11.08.2001 | DE10111405 | 08.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10139648 | 14.07.2005 | B4 | DE10139648 | 02.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10139648 | 11.08.2001 | DE10111405 | 08.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI298713B | 11.07.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | DE10139648 | 11.08.2001 | DE10111405 | 08.03.2001 |