Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1392439
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.11.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
30.11.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
28.11.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.11.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.10.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.09.2007 |
Change - designated states |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
22.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.05.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.02.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.02.2007 |
First examination report |
|
29.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
06.08.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
06.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2004 |
Change - inventor |
published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] |
19.01.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
19.01.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
14.10.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|