Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7168645 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2007 | B2 | US2003111567 | 19.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10127258 | 05.06.2001 | EP0206131 | 04.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1392439 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2008 | B1 | EP1392439 | 03.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10127258 | 05.06.2001 | EP0206131 | 04.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0205437 | 14.12.2010 | B1 | BR0205437 | 01.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10127258 | 05.06.2001 | EP0206131 | 04.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE20208669U | 29.08.2002 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE10127258 | 05.06.2001 | DE20208669 | 04.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50211464D1 | 14.02.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10127258 | 05.06.2001 | EP0206131 | 04.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1392439T | 13.05.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE10127258 | 05.06.2001 | EP0206131 | 04.06.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02098564 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10127258 | 05.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE382430T | 15.01.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10127258 | 05.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10127258 | 12.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10127258 | 05.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2295380T | 16.04.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE10127258 | 05.06.2001 |