EP1392439 - LIFT WALL FOR A TUBE MILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polysius AG Graf-Galen-Strasse 17 59269 Beckum / DE | [2004/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLATTON, Gerhard Elisabeth-Wibbelt-Str. 10 59269 Beckum / DE | 02 /
GROTHAUS, Hubert Kronesch 11 49186 Bad Iburg / DE | 03 /
SCHULTE, Ludger Ludgeristrasse 1 59229 Ahlen / DE | [2004/19] |
Former [2004/10] | 01 /
BLATTON, Gerhard Hansaring 1 59269 Beckum / DE | ||
02 /
GROTHAUS, Hubert Kronesch 11 49186 Bad Iburg / DE | |||
03 /
SCHULTE, Ludger Ludgeristrasse 1 59229 Ahlen / DE | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Michael, et al Tetzner & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Tetzner, Michael, Dipl.-Ing., et al Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02754624.1 | 04.06.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002EP06131 | Priority number, date | DE20011027258 | 05.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10127258 | [2004/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02098564 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1392439 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1392439 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B02C17/06, B02C17/18 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
B02C17/1855 (EP,US);
B02C17/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES [2007/44] |
Former [2004/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HUBWAND FÜR EINE ROHRMÜHLE | [2004/10] | English: | LIFT WALL FOR A TUBE MILL | [2004/10] | French: | PAROI DE LEVAGE POUR TUBE BROYEUR | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 08.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US1719164 (RICHARD BERNHARD) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 9 - line 14 * * page 1, line 65 - line 94 * * page 2, line 125 - page 3, line 5 * * figures 1-3 * * figure 2 * [A] 9; | [A]GB387412 (VICKERS ARMSTRONGS LTD, et al) [A] 1,3 * page 4, line 35 - line 45 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE2445439 (FREIER GRUNDER EISEN METALL) [A] 1,3 * page 4, line 9 - line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]US4089477 (TIGGESBAUMKER PETER, et al) [A] 4* column 1, line 31 - line 32 *; | [A]DE19638698 (PFEIFFER CHRISTIAN MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |