EP1406566 - CATHETER SYSTEM WITH ON-BOARD TEMPERATURE PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radiant Medical, Inc. 250 Chesapeake Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2004/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMMACK, Amy, L. 558 Irving Avenue San Jose, CA 95128 / US | 02 /
CALLISTER, Jeff, P. 955 Cambridge Road Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 03 /
STUL, Paul, M. 235 41st Avenue San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 04 /
ROTH, Alex, T. 1354 Regent Street Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 05 /
TREMULI, William, S. 399 Mindinao Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/16] | 01 /
HAMMACK, Amy, L. 420 E. Bellevue, Apt. B San Mateo, CA 94401 / US | ||
02 /
CALLISTER, Jeff, P. 955 Cambridge Road Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | |||
03 /
STUL, Paul, M. 235 41st Avenue San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | |||
04 /
ROTH, Alex, T. 1354 Regent Street Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | |||
05 /
TREMULI, William, S. 399 Mindinao Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | Representative(s) | Coates, Ian Harold, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Coates, Ian Harold, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2004/16] | Coates, Ian Harold, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02761084.9 | 12.07.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002US22068 | Priority number, date | US20010905389 | 13.07.2001 Original published format: US 905389 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03006085 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1406566 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1406566 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/12 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
A61F7/12 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00088 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0054 (US);
A61F2007/0096 (US);
A61F2007/126 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATHETERSYSTEM MIT EINGEBAUTEM TEMPERATURFÜHLER | [2004/16] | English: | CATHETER SYSTEM WITH ON-BOARD TEMPERATURE PROBE | [2004/16] | French: | SYSTEME DE CATHETER AVEC SONDE DE TEMPERATURE INCORPOREE | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Request for further processing for: | 29.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2008 | BE | 21.05.2008 | CY | 21.05.2008 | CZ | 21.05.2008 | DK | 21.05.2008 | EE | 21.05.2008 | FI | 21.05.2008 | IT | 21.05.2008 | NL | 21.05.2008 | SK | 21.05.2008 | TR | 21.05.2008 | LU | 12.07.2008 | CH | 31.07.2008 | LI | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | BG | 21.08.2008 | SE | 21.08.2008 | GR | 22.08.2008 | ES | 01.09.2008 | PT | 21.10.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CY | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
TR | 21.05.2008 | ||
LU | 12.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CY | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
LU | 12.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
LU | 12.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 01.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5542928 (EVANS MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,12-21,24,27-30,35,37,38* column 13, line 46 - column 14, line 15; figure 8 * | International search | [X]WO9401177 (TECHNOMED INT SA [FR], et al); | [Y]US6117065 (HASTINGS ROGER N [US], et al); | [Y]US6127597 (BEYAR MORDECHAY [IL], et al); | [Y]US6264679 (KELLER WADE E [US], et al); | [X]US6383144 (MOONEY CHARLES R [US], et al) | by applicant | US6149673 | US6149676 | US6231594 | US2002045925 | US6620189 |