25.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
13.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
09.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
17.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
12.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
01.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
14.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
15.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
01.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
01.08.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
25.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
09.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
22.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
01.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
21.12.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
24.08.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
18.08.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.08.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.05.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
08.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.10.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.07.2006 |
First examination report |
|
22.07.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.07.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
08.06.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
04.06.2004 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] |
05.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.12.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
12.12.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
11.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|