Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20040007490 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0210889 | 08.04.2002 | US82839801 | 06.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004530352 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0210889 | 08.04.2002 | US82839801 | 06.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1384324 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2007 | B1 | EP1384324 | 21.07.2004 | A4 | EP1384324 | 28.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0210889 | 08.04.2002 | US82839801 | 06.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60222648D1 | 08.11.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0210889 | 08.04.2002 | US82839801 | 06.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02082649 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82839801 | 06.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE374453T | 15.10.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US82839801 | 06.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1217485C | 31.08.2005 | C | CN1518795 | 04.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US82839801 | 06.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6501317 | 31.12.2002 | B2 | US2002145460 | 10.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82839801 | 06.04.2001 |