EP1384324 - A CMOS CIRCUIT WITH CONSTANT OUTPUT SWING AND VARIABLE TIME DELAY FOR A VOLTAGE CONTROLLED OSCILLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elantec Semiconductor, Inc. 675 Tradezone Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2004/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Xijian 40951 Valero Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 02 /
HARVEY, Barry 1701 Holt Avenue Los Altos, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
FAIRGRIEVE, Alexander 835 Sharon Park Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2007/25] |
Former [2004/05] | 01 /
LIN, Xijian 40951 Valero Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | ||
02 /
HARVEY, Barry 1701 Holt Avenue Los Altos, CA 94025 / US | |||
03 /
FAIRGRIEVE, Alexander 2139 Gordon Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/05] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. Fleuchaus & Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02763975.6 | 08.04.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002US10889 | Priority number, date | US20010828398 | 06.04.2001 Original published format: US 828398 | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02082649 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1384324 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1384324 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/08 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
H03H11/265 (EP,US);
H03K5/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CMOS-SCHALTUNG MIT KONSTANTEM AUSGANGSSPANNUNGSHUB UND VARIABLE ZEITVERZÖGERUNG FÜR EINEN SPANNUNGSGESTEUERTEN OSZILLATOR | [2004/05] | English: | A CMOS CIRCUIT WITH CONSTANT OUTPUT SWING AND VARIABLE TIME DELAY FOR A VOLTAGE CONTROLLED OSCILLATOR | [2004/05] | French: | CIRCUIT CMOS AVEC EXCURSION DE SORTIE CONSTANTE ET RETARD VARIABLE POUR OSCILLATEUR A FREQUENCE COMMANDEE | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.09.2007 | BE | 26.09.2007 | CH | 26.09.2007 | CY | 26.09.2007 | DK | 26.09.2007 | FI | 26.09.2007 | LI | 26.09.2007 | NL | 26.09.2007 | TR | 26.09.2007 | SE | 26.12.2007 | GR | 27.12.2007 | DE | 28.12.2007 | ES | 06.01.2008 | PT | 26.02.2008 | GB | 08.04.2008 | IE | 08.04.2008 | LU | 08.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CY | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
TR | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
GB | 08.04.2008 | ||
IE | 08.04.2008 | ||
LU | 08.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CY | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
GB | 08.04.2008 | ||
IE | 08.04.2008 | ||
LU | 08.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
CY | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
GB | 08.04.2008 | ||
IE | 08.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
GB | 08.04.2008 | ||
IE | 08.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
IE | 08.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
DK | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
DE | 28.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
SE | 26.12.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
CH | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
LI | 26.09.2007 | ||
NL | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
ES | 06.01.2008 | ||
PT | 26.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
BE | 26.09.2007 | ||
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
GR | 27.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 26.09.2007 | |
FI | 26.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 26.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0689287 (SYMBIOS LOGIC INC [US]) [X] 1-9* figure 11 * | International search | [X]US5994939 (JOHNSON LUKE A [US], et al) |