Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6989458 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2006 | B2 | US2005192451 | 01.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2128404 | 22.12.2004 | KR20010025011 | 08.05.2001 | US47611503 | 24.10.2003 | KR0200845 | 07.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6852880 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2005 | B2 | US2004116693 | 17.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20010025011 | 08.05.2001 | KR0200845 | 07.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3989377B | Global Dossier | 10.10.2007 | B2 | JP2004526802 | 02.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20010025011 | 08.05.2001 | KR0200845 | 07.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1385819 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2015 | B1 | EP1385819 | 26.01.2005 | A4 | EP1385819 | 04.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20010025011 | 08.05.2001 | KR0200845 | 07.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU230726 | 28.12.2017 | B1 | HUP0303985 | 28.12.2012 | A3 | HUP0303985 | 28.04.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20010025011 | 08.05.2001 | KR0200845 | 07.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL158634 | 24.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20010025011 | 08.05.2001 | KR0200845 | 07.05.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02090324 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20010025011 | 08.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100437873B | Global Dossier | 26.06.2004 | B1 | KR20020085490 | 16.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20010025011 | 08.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ20033033 | 17.03.2004 | A3 | Priority number | Date | KR20010025011 | 08.05.2001 |