|
13.01.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.12.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.11.2004 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2004 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2003 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.07.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
17.07.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
17.07.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.07.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.07.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.07.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.04.2003 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/405 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.03.2003 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.02.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
06.02.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.02.2003 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.12.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.12.2002 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.12.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
30.08.2002 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |